EP0856952 - A method and a circuit arrangement for the processing of received signals in a telecommunication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2006 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [1998/32] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Östman, Kjell Tukkikatu 17B 24240 Salo / FI | 02 /
Kuusinen, Tero Menninkäisenkatu 10 C 20 20540 Turku / FI | [1998/32] | Representative(s) | Kupiainen, Juhani Kalervo Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1998/32] | Kupiainen, Juhani Kalervo Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 98660008.8 | 30.01.1998 | [1998/32] | Priority number, date | FI19970000437 | 31.01.1997 Original published format: FI 970437 | [1998/32] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0856952 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0856952 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | [2003/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0856952 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/40, H04B1/26 | [1998/32] | CPC: |
H04B1/0007 (EP,US);
H03D7/161 (EP,US);
H04B1/0003 (EP,US);
H04B1/005 (EP,US);
H04B1/0057 (EP,US);
H04B1/006 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2003/45] |
Former [1998/32] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Schaltung zur Empfangssignalverarbeitung in einen Telekommunikationssystem | [1998/32] | English: | A method and a circuit arrangement for the processing of received signals in a telecommunication system | [1998/32] | French: | Procédé et circuit de traîtement de signaux reçus dans un système de télécommunication | [1998/32] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 12.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 03.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 05.10.2005 | IT | 05.10.2005 | NL | 05.10.2005 | SE | 05.01.2006 | ES | 16.01.2006 | [2008/15] |
Former [2006/33] | FI | 05.10.2005 | |
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 05.10.2005 | |
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/24] | FI | 05.10.2005 | |
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | NL | 05.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH0738513 (NEC CORP) [X] 1,3,6,8 [Y] 2,4,5,7,9-11; | US5630218 [ ] (MUTO HIROYASU [JP]) [ ] * column 2, line 9 - line 36; figures 5,6 *; | [Y]WO9221195 (OMNIPOINT CORP [US]) [Y] 2,4,5,7,9-11 * page 2, line 20 - line 30 * * page 9, lines 17-26 * |