EP0903566 - Imaging system functioning on submillimeter waves [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.2005 [2005/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oxford Instruments Analytical Oy Nihtisillankuja 5 02631 Espoo / FI | [2005/01] |
Former [1999/12] | For all designated states Metorex International OY Nihtisillankuja 5 02630 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Luukanen, Arttu Aurorankatu 13 A 2 00100 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
Sipilä, Heikki Hannuksenkuja 1 C 02270 Espoo / FI | 03 /
Viitanen, Veli-Pekka Männistöntie 6 E 17 02880 Veikkola / FI | [1999/12] | Representative(s) | Brax, Matti Juhani Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1999/12] | Brax, Matti Juhani Berggren Oy Ab, P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 98660091.4 | 15.09.1998 | [1999/12] | Priority number, date | FI19970003699 | 16.09.1997 Original published format: FI 973699 | [1999/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0903566 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0903566 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | [2000/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0903566 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01J5/20 | [1999/12] | CPC: |
G01J3/2823 (EP,US);
H04N5/30 (US);
G01J5/0837 (EP,US);
G01J5/20 (EP,US);
G01S17/89 (EP,US);
G01S3/784 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/02] |
Former [1999/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bildgebendes System mit Submillimeterwellen | [1999/12] | English: | Imaging system functioning on submillimeter waves | [1999/12] | French: | Système d'imagerie avec des ondes submillimétriques | [1999/12] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 13.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0354369 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1* page 3, line 31 - line 40; figure 1 *; | [A]US5171733 (HU QING [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 7 - line 15 * * column 4, line 51 - line 61 * * column 5, line 20 - line 28 * | Examination | EP0459010 | WO9325877 | US5286976 | FR2735574 |