EP0922806 - Resin-impregnated belt for application on papermaking machines and in similar industrial applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP. 1373 Broadway Albany, New York 12204 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/24] | For all designated states ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP. 1373 Broadway Albany, New York 12204 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dutt, William H. 9 Indian Pipe Drive Wynantskill, New York 12198 / US | [1999/24] | Representative(s) | Papula, Antti Papula Oy P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1999/24] | Papula, Antti Papula Rein Lahtela Oy, P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 98660133.4 | 01.12.1998 | [1999/24] | Priority number, date | US19970987827 | 09.12.1997 Original published format: US 987827 | [1999/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0922806 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0922806 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | [1999/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0922806 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | D21F3/02 | [1999/24] | CPC: |
D21F3/0227 (EP,US);
D21F1/0027 (EP,KR,US);
D21F3/0236 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S162/901 (EP,US);
Y10T442/103 (EP,US);
Y10T442/172 (EP,US);
Y10T442/184 (EP,US);
Y10T442/198 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3049 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3179 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3317 (EP,US);
Y10T442/419 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2000/15] |
Former [1999/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Harzimprägniertes Band zur Anwendung in Papiermaschinen und dergleichen industriellen Anwendungen | [2002/44] | English: | Resin-impregnated belt for application on papermaking machines and in similar industrial applications | [1999/24] | French: | Bande imprégnée de résine pour l'utilisation dans des machines à papier et autres appplications industrielles similaires | [1999/24] |
Former [1999/24] | Harzimprägniertes Band zur Anwendung in Papiermaschinen und dergleichen industrielle Anwendungen | Examination procedure | 07.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 24.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.12.2003 | [2005/01] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9201143U (VOITH) [A] 1-3,6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4125279 (VOITH GMBH J M [DE]) [A] 57* the whole document *; | [A]EP0659934 (APPLETON MILLS [US]) [A] 1,2,6,16,17 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2287484 (SCAPA GROUP PLC [GB]) [A] 1,2,6 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP0859082 (VOITH SULZER PAPIERMASCH GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1,2,6 * the whole document * |