EP0937586 - Wheel for a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.12.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2003 | Refusal of application | published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Märk, Marco Baselstrasse 16 4144 Arlesheim / CH | [1999/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/34] | Representative(s) | Eder, Carl E. Braunpat Braun Eder AG Patent - Marken - Rechtsanwälte Reussstrasse 22 Postfach 4015 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | Eder, Carl E. Patentanwaltsbüro EDER AG Lindenhofstrasse 40 4052 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 98810145.7 | 24.02.1998 | [1999/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0937586 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60C5/00, B60C17/06 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
B60C17/06 (EP,US);
B60C17/065 (EP,US);
B60C19/002 (EP,US);
B60C5/002 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10378 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10396 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/18] |
Former [1999/34] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Für ein Fahrzeug bestimmtes Laufrad | [1999/34] | English: | Wheel for a vehicle | [1999/34] | French: | Roue pour véhicule | [1999/34] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/16] | 26.02.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 12.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2004/05] | 05.09.2003 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2004/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.04.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DYA]GB581810 (JAMES URMSTON) [DY] 4,5 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,6,7; | [A]US3022810 (LAMBE DONALD M) [A] 1,2,7 * column W *; | [Y]FR1322887 (MICHELIN & CIE) [Y] 1-7 * column W *; | [Y]DE2544474 (STADTFELD ARTUR) [Y] 1-3,6,7 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9749566 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR], et al) [A] 1-3* the whole document * |