EP0940179 - Linking device for the connection of adjacent elements of pipes or containers, particularly for laboratory equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Büchi Labortechnik AG Meierseggstrasse 40 9230 Flawil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/36] | For all designated states Büchi Labortechnik AG Meierseggstrasse 40 CH-9230 Flawil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Widmer, Richard Nelkenstrasse 10 9200 Gossau / CH | 02 /
Sanwald, Marco Bischofszellerstrasse 23 9200 Gossau / CH | [1999/36] | Representative(s) | Hepp, Dieter, et al Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/36] | Hepp, Dieter, et al Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG, Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | Application number, filing date | 98810192.9 | 06.03.1998 | [1999/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0940179 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0940179 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, F16L49/00, F16L21/06 | [1999/36] | CPC: |
B01L3/565 (EP,US);
F16L21/06 (EP,US);
F16L23/032 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/20] |
Former [1999/36] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbindungselement zum Verbinden benachbarter Anschlusselemente an Rohren und/oder Behältermündungen, insbesondere an Laborgeräten | [1999/36] | English: | Linking device for the connection of adjacent elements of pipes or containers, particularly for laboratory equipment | [1999/36] | French: | Dispositif de connexion d'éléments adjacents de conduits ou de recipients, notamment pour materiel de laboratoire | [1999/36] | Examination procedure | 05.11.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 09.02.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LU, MC | 21.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.04.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 07.05.2003 | FR | 07.05.2003 | IE | 07.05.2003 | IT | 07.05.2003 | NL | 07.05.2003 | DK | 07.08.2003 | GR | 07.08.2003 | PT | 07.08.2003 | SE | 07.08.2003 | ES | 18.08.2003 | [2008/15] |
Former [2006/14] | FI | 07.05.2003 | |
FR | 07.05.2003 | ||
IE | 07.05.2003 | ||
NL | 07.05.2003 | ||
DK | 07.08.2003 | ||
GR | 07.08.2003 | ||
PT | 07.08.2003 | ||
SE | 07.08.2003 | ||
ES | 18.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | FI | 07.05.2003 | |
IE | 07.05.2003 | ||
NL | 07.05.2003 | ||
DK | 07.08.2003 | ||
GR | 07.08.2003 | ||
PT | 07.08.2003 | ||
SE | 07.08.2003 | ||
ES | 18.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | FI | 07.05.2003 | |
IE | 07.05.2003 | ||
NL | 07.05.2003 | ||
GR | 07.08.2003 | ||
PT | 07.08.2003 | ||
SE | 07.08.2003 | ||
ES | 18.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 07.05.2003 | |
NL | 07.05.2003 | ||
GR | 07.08.2003 | ||
PT | 07.08.2003 | ||
SE | 07.08.2003 | ||
ES | 18.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | NL | 07.05.2003 | |
GR | 07.08.2003 | ||
PT | 07.08.2003 | ||
SE | 07.08.2003 | ||
ES | 18.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | NL | 07.05.2003 | |
GR | 07.08.2003 | ||
PT | 07.08.2003 | ||
SE | 07.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 07.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1600403 (BERGHOEFER DIPL KFM HANS) [A] 2,5 * figure - *; | [A]FR2232728 (BRUDER MANNESMANN KG [DE]) [A] 1,9 * page 3, line 16 - line 35; figure - *; | [XY]US3910610 (TURNER FRANK E, et al) [X] 1,3,9,10 * column 3, line 3 - line 14 * * column 3, line 40 - line 54; figures 4,5 * * column 4, line 3 - line 9; figures 9,10 * * column 4, line 21 - line 42 * * column 5, line 39 - line 50; claim 1 * [Y] 4; | [Y]DE2655959 (KOTTER MANFRED DIPL ING) [Y] 4 * figure 1 *; | [A]CH614905 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4381020 (DAGHE JOSEPH L, et al) [A] 2,5 * column 6, line 43 - line 65; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0180656 (QVF GLASTECH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,1,4 * page 5, line 20 - line 32 ** page 5, line 36 - page 6, line 3 * |