EP0869238 - Tamper resistant electronic lock and method of using same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2004 [2004/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MR Electronic SA Allée du Quartz 11 2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds / CH | [1998/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Monnier, Jean-Luc Bois-Gentil 9 2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds / CH | [1998/41] | Representative(s) | Gresset, Jean Vernets 1 2035 Corcelles / CH | [1998/41] | Application number, filing date | 98810246.3 | 23.03.1998 | [1998/41] | Priority number, date | US19970823441 | 24.03.1997 Original published format: US 823441 | [1998/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0869238 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0869238 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | [2000/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E05B49/00, H02H9/00 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
H02H9/026 (EP,US);
G07C9/0069 (EP,US);
G07C9/00896 (EP,US);
H02H9/042 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7153 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/41] | E05B49/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT, SE [2001/36] |
Former [1998/41] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gegen unbefugte Manipulation gesichertes elektronisches Schloss und Verwendungsart desgleichen. | [1998/41] | English: | Tamper resistant electronic lock and method of using same | [1998/41] | French: | Serrure avec système de sécurité contre les manipulations non autorisées et méthode d'utilisation de celle-ci | [1998/41] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 14.06.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC | 05.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/12] | 17.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.07.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4050063 (SCHULL GEORGE R) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 10, line 49 - column 11, line 21 * [Y] 3,4,6; | [XY]DE3908236 (DEHN & SOEHNE [DE]) [X] 5 * abstract * * column 1, line 55 - column 3, line 26 * [Y] 3,4,6; | [A]US4967577 (GARTNER KLAUS W [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 35; claims 8,9 *; | [A]US5460020 (HUNGERFORD ROBERT E [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 9, line 4 - line 16 *; | [A]US4459632 (NIJMAN ALOYSIUS J [NL], et al) [A] 5 * abstract * |