EP0953748 - Power plant with a CO2-cycle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/44] | Process for operating a power plant with a CO2-cycle | ||
[2003/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.01.2005 [2005/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM (Switzerland) Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5401 Baden / CH | [2004/05] |
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states ALSTOM (Switzerland) Ltd CHSP Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5401 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states Alstom 25, Avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2000/22] | For all designated states ABB ALSTOM POWER (Schweiz) AG 5401 Baden / CH | ||
Former [1999/44] | For all designated states Asea Brown Boveri AG Haselstrasse 16 5401 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frutschi, Hans Ulrich Bruggerstrasse 9 5223 Riniken / CH | 02 /
Wettstein, Hans, Dr. Clarastrasse 12 5442 Fislisbach / CH | [1999/44] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2003/19] |
Former [2003/15] | Weiland, Andreas, et al Alstom (Switzerland) Ltd CHSP Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7/699/5 5401 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2002/48] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2001/50] | Liebe, Rainer, et al ALSTOM (Schweiz) AG Intellectual Property CHSP Haselstrasse 16/699, 5. Stock 5401 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 98810378.4 | 28.04.1998 | [1999/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0953748 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0953748 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F02C3/34, F01K21/04, F02C3/20 | [1999/44] | CPC: |
F02C3/34 (EP,US);
F01K21/047 (EP,US);
F02C1/06 (EP,US);
F05D2260/211 (EP,US);
Y02E20/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, GB, NL [2000/28] |
Former [1999/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kraftwerksanlage mit einem CO2-Prozess | [2003/36] | English: | Power plant with a CO2-cycle | [2003/36] | French: | Centrale d'énergie avec un cycle de CO2 | [2003/36] |
Former [1999/44] | Verfahren zum Betrieb einer Kraftwerksanlage mit einem CO2-Prozess | ||
Former [1999/44] | Process for operating a power plant with a CO2-cycle | ||
Former [1999/44] | Procédé de fonctionnement d'une centrale d'énergie avec un cycle de CO2 | Examination procedure | 31.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/22] | 05.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04279729 ; | [A]FR2202231 (BBC SULZER TURBOMASCHINEN [CH]) [A] 4,7,8* page 3, line 8 - page 5, paragraph 1; figure - *; | [X]US4498289 (OSGERBY IAN [US]) [X] 1,6,9,13 * column 6, line 34 - column 8, line 27; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3643401 (GREUL ARTUR RICHARD [DE]) [A] 1-3,13 * column 4, line 31 - line 65; figure 1 *; | [A]US5175995 (PAK PYONG-SIK [JP], et al) [A] 1,13 * column 6, line 6 - line 57; figure 2 *; | [X]DE4303174 (SCHWIEGER JOACHIM DIPL ING [DE]) [X] 1,4,6,13 * column 2, line 14 - column 4, line 39; figure - *; | [X]WO9502115 (LOEYTTY ARI VELI OLAVI [FI]) [X] 1,6,13 * page 7, line 19 - page 9, line 4; figure 8 *; | [A]WO9744574 (NONOX ENG AB [SE], et al) [A] 9 * page 3, line 21 - page 6, line 27 * * page 8, line 26 - line 34; figure - *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930217), vol. 017, no. 080, Database accession no. (M - 1368), & JP04279729 A 19921005 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - YULIN SHAO ET AL, "NATURAL GAS FIRED COMBINED CYCLE POWER PLANT WITH CO2 CAPTURE", ENERGY CONVERSION AND MANAGEMENT, (19951201), vol. 36, no. 12, pages 1115 - 1128, XP000529061 [A] 1-3,10,13 * page 118, line 14 - page 1121, paragraph 1 * * page 1126, paragraph L - page 1127, line 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0196-8904(95)00008-2 | by applicant | EP0620362 |