Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] |
09.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
28.06.2001 | Surcharge for renewal fee | |
08.12.2000 | Loss of particular rights | |
23.08.2000 | Loss of particular rights | |
14.08.2000 | Change - extension states | |
16.06.2000 | Definitive list of designations | published on 02.08.2000 [2000/31] |
15.06.2000 | Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) | |
12.05.2000 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.06.2000 [2000/26] |
27.04.2000 | Renewal fee | |
08.10.1999 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.11.1999 [1999/47] |