EP0959582 - Process and architecture for controlling traffic on a digital communication link [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASCOM TECH AG Berner Technopark, Morgenstrasse 129 3018 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/47] | For all designated states ASCOM TECH AG Berner Technopark, Morgenstrasse 129 3018 Bern / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kühnel, Thomas, Dr. Münstergasse 12 3011 Bern / CH | 02 /
Martignoni, Stéphane 61, rue de Berne 1201 Genève / CH | 03 /
Wu, Yung-Shain, Dr. Mattenweg 10A 2557 Studen / CH | [1999/47] | Representative(s) | Roshardt, Werner Alfred Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Eigerstrasse 2 Postfach 3000 Bern 14 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/47] | Roshardt, Werner Alfred, Dipl.-Phys. Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Zeughausgasse 5 Postfach 3000 Bern 7 / CH | Application number, filing date | 98810469.1 | 20.05.1998 | [1999/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0959582 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/12, H04L12/56, H04Q11/04 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
H04L43/0876 (EP);
H04L43/0823 (EP);
H04L43/0847 (EP);
H04L43/0852 (EP);
H04L43/087 (EP);
H04L43/0888 (EP);
H04L43/16 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2000/31] |
Former [1999/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Architektur um den Verkehr auf einem digitalen Kommunicationskanal zu kontrollieren | [1999/47] | English: | Process and architecture for controlling traffic on a digital communication link | [1999/47] | French: | Procédé et architecture pour contrôler le traffic sur une liaison de communication numérique | [1999/47] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 25.05.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 01.12.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/24] | 14.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.06.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9411955 (PERICLE COMMUNICAT CO) [X] 1,2,4,6,7 * page 52, line 22 - page 53, line 8 * * page 55, line 16 - line 19 * * page 57, line 14 - line 18 * * figures 18,19,23,24; table 8 * [A] 5; | [XA]WO9311618 (COMMW OF AUSTRALIA) [X] 1,2,4,6,7 * page 2, line 9 - line 14 * * page 7, line 14 - line 22 * * page 15, line 15 - line 29 * * page 16, line 1 - line 24 * * page 17, line 2 - line 7 * * figures 7,9 * [A] 8; | [XA]EP0643508 (THOMSON CSF) [X] 1,2,4,6,7 * page 2, line 9 - line 29 * * page 3, line 2 - line 9 * * page 5, line 53 - page 6, line 17 * * figure 1 * [A] 8; | [X] - KIM Y J ET AL, "A NEW MEDIUM ACCESS CONTROL SCHEME FOR WIRELESS ATM NETWORKS", 1997 IEEE 47TH. VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, PHOENIX, MAY 4 - 7, 1997, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19970504), vol. 1, no. CONF. 47, pages 295 - 299, XP000701807 [X] 7,8 * abstract * * sections 2, 3.1 * |