EP0889531 - MOS-controlled semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2000 [2000/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASEA BROWN BOVERI AG Haselstrasse 16 5401 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states Asea Brown Boveri AG Haselstrasse 16 5401 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bauer, Friedhelm, Dr. Hammerweg 17 5702 Niederlenz / CH | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Weibel, Beat, et al ABB (Schweiz) AG Immaterialgüterrecht(TEI) Haselstrasse 16/699 I 5401 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Weibel, Beat, et al Asea Brown Boveri AG Immaterialgüterrecht(TEI) Haselstrasse 16/699 I 5401 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 98810484.0 | 25.05.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | DE1997127676 | 30.06.1997 Original published format: DE 19727676 | [1999/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0889531 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/739 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
H01L29/0696 (EP);
H01L29/1095 (EP);
H01L29/7397 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [1999/37] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | MOS gesteuertes Halbleiterbauelement | [1999/01] | English: | MOS-controlled semiconductor device | [1999/01] | French: | Dispositif semiconducteur controlé MOS | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 08.07.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/23] | 10.01.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.10.1999 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.1999 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.10.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.10.1999 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US5585651 (NAKAGAWA AKIO ET AL) [X] 1,2,5,7 * figures 43,91 * [A] 3,6,8 [Y] 3; | [X]EP0746030 (SILICONIX INC) [X] 1 * figures 3,4,7,9-12 *; | [Y]EP0746042 (SILICONIX INC) [Y] 3 * figure 1 *; | [DA]DE19500588 (ABB MANAGEMENT AG) [DA] 2-4 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0536668 (NIPPON DENSO CO) [A] 1 * figure 2B *; | [A]WO9103078 (IXYS CORP) [A] 1 * figures 3A-3C,4 *; | [PX]DE19722441 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [PX] 1 * figures 35,36 * |