blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0968921

EP0968921 - Device for feeding an supplemental sheet to a stack of printed articles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/01]Method and device for feeding an supplemental sheet to a stack of printed articles
[2003/08]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.07.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.09.2004  [2004/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GRAPHA-HOLDING AG
Seestrasse 41, Postfach 170
6052 Hergiswil / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
GRAPHA-HOLDING AG
Seestrasse 41, Postfach 170
6052 Hergiswil / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Plüss, Thomas Albert
Hottigergass 2
4800 Zofingen / CH
[2000/01]
Application number, filing date98810622.503.07.1998
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968921
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968921
Date:17.09.2003
Language:DE
[2003/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.12.1998
ClassificationIPC:B65B25/14, B65B61/20
[2000/01]
CPC:
B65B61/20 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/37]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Zuführen einer Beilage zu einem Stapel von Druckerzeugnissen[2003/08]
English:Device for feeding an supplemental sheet to a stack of printed articles[2003/08]
French:Dispositif pour alimenter une feuille supplémentaire à une pile d'articles imprimés[2003/08]
Former [2000/01]Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Zuführen einer Beilage zu einem Stapel von Druckerzeugnissen
Former [2000/01]Method and device for feeding an supplemental sheet to a stack of printed articles
Former [2000/01]Procédé et dispositif pour alimenter une feuille supplémentaire à une pile d'articles imprimés
Examination procedure02.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/26]
31.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2003Fee for grant paid
20.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
09.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
11.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US3356361  (GEISLER) [X] 1-3,5-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3440796  (HARRISON);
 [A]US4691502  (CONVEY)
ExaminationWO9634800
 EP0829441
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.