EP0894759 - Method for manufacturing book blocks out of different printed sheets inserted into each other, said sheets having quartersheets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2003 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.09.2003 [2003/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRAPHA-HOLDING AG Seestrasse 41, Postfach 170 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | For all designated states GRAPHA-HOLDING AG Seestrasse 41, Postfach 170 6052 Hergiswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bräker, Arnold Gotzenwilerstrasse 4 8405 Winterthur / CH | 02 /
Weibel, Wilfried Gallusstrasse 47A 9500 Wil / CH | [1999/16] |
Former [1999/05] | 01 /
Bräker, Arnold Gotzenwilerstrasse 4 8405 Winterthur / DE | ||
02 /
Weibel, Wilfried Gallusstrasse 47A 9500 Wil / DE | Application number, filing date | 98810683.7 | 16.07.1998 | [1999/05] | Priority number, date | CH19970001775 | 22.07.1997 Original published format: CH 177597 | [1999/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0894759 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0894759 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65H39/055, B65H5/14 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
B65H39/055 (EP,US);
B65H5/14 (EP,US);
Y10T83/2183 (EP,US);
Y10T83/219 (EP,US);
Y10T83/463 (EP,US);
Y10T83/4635 (EP,US);
Y10T83/658 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1999/41] |
Former [1999/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Buchblöcken aus verschiedenen, mehrere ineinandergesteckte Viertelbogen aufweisenden Druckbogen | [1999/05] | English: | Method for manufacturing book blocks out of different printed sheets inserted into each other, said sheets having quartersheets | [1999/05] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de blocs de livres faites de feuilles pliées en quatre imprimées qui sont insérées l'une dans l'autre. | [1999/05] | Examination procedure | 16.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/37] | 19.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/39] | Request for further processing for: | 17.06.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 17.06.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.07.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE3126769 (GRAPHA HOLDING AG [CH]) [DA] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2843831 (MEYER ROLF FA) [A] 1,6 * the whole document * |