EP0898139 - Extruderbarrel with a heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/08] | Heat exchanger, more particularly for a heating and cooling arrangement for an extruder tube | ||
[2003/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grüter Elektroapparate AG Weingasse 5 8303 Bassersdorf / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/35] | For all designated states GRÜTER ELEKTROAPPARATE AG Weingasse 5 CH-8303 Bassersdorf / CH | ||
Former [1999/08] | For all designated states GRÜTER ELEKTROAPPARATE AG Weingasse 5 CH-8303 Bassersdordf / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kühler, Paul Rebhaldenstrasse 29 8303 Bassersdorf / CH | [1999/08] | Representative(s) | BOVARD AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3013 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/08] | BOVARD AG - Patentanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 98810743.9 | 31.07.1998 | [1999/08] | Priority number, date | CH19970001940 | 19.08.1997 Original published format: CH 194097 | [1999/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0898139 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0898139 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | [2000/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0898139 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F28F1/12, B29C47/82 | [1999/08] | CPC: |
F28F1/105 (EP,US);
B29C48/12 (EP,US);
B29C48/13 (EP,US);
B29C48/83 (EP,US);
B29C48/832 (EP,US);
B29C48/834 (EP,US);
B29C48/07 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [2001/05] |
Former [1999/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Extruderrohr mit einem Wärmetauscher | [2003/10] | English: | Extruderbarrel with a heat exchanger | [2003/10] | French: | Tube d'extrudeuse avec un échangeur de chaleur | [2003/10] |
Former [1999/08] | Wärmetauscher, insbesondere für eine Heiz- und Kühlanordnung eines Extruderrohres | ||
Former [1999/08] | Heat exchanger, more particularly for a heating and cooling arrangement for an extruder tube | ||
Former [1999/08] | Echangeur de chaleur, en particulier pour un dispositif de chauffage et de refroidissement d'un tube d'extrudeuse | Examination procedure | 29.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 25.11.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, GR, IE, MC, PT, SE | 07.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.12.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2589262 (KEITH PERCIVAL C) [X] 1-3 * column 4, line 68 - column 7, line 33; figures 4,5 * [Y] 6,8; | [Y]FR1462160 (CHAUSSON USINES SA) [Y] 8 * page 2, column L, line 7 - page 3, column R, line 55; figures 1-12 *; | [Y]US3263313 (MODINE ARTHUR B) [Y] 6 * column 2, line 19 - line 34; figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB1301666 (ASSOCIATED ENGINEERING LTD) [A] 1,8 * page 1, line 85 - page 3, line 66; figures 1-11 *; | [A]US3716750 (NAKADA K, et al) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 38 - column 2, line 60; figure 2 *; | [A]US3743252 (SCHOTT C); | [A]US3907032 (DEGROOTE RAYMOND S, et al) [A] 1,8,9,13,14 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 9; figure 7 *; | [Y]US4059882 (WUNDER JOHN E) [Y] 8,9,13,14 * column 3, line 18 - line 43; figures 2,3 *; | [XY]GB2037069 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1,3 * page 2, line 38 - page 3, line 38; figure 5 * [Y] 8,9,13,14; | [A]US5200205 (WISSMANN SIEGFRIED R [US], et al) [A] 1,15-17 * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 48; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0611251 (MAILLEFER NOKIA SA [CH]) [A] 1,3,4,15-17 * column 4, line 40 - column 5, line 41; figures 4,5 *; | [A]US5561338 (ROBERTS ROY D [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 1 - column 3, line 19; figure 2 * |