EP0982212 - Device for force introduction into a component constructed of composite fibres [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2001 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2001 [2001/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55 CH-6052 Hergiswil NW / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmid, Samuel Zimmerrainstrasse 10 5525 Fischbach-Göslikon / CH | 02 /
Niedermeier, Michael, Dr.-Ing. Langriedstrasse 10 8512 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | 03 /
Anderegg, Kurt, Dr. sc.tech. Thalerstrasse 83 9424 Rheineck / CH | [2000/09] | Application number, filing date | 98810848.6 | 27.08.1998 | [2000/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0982212 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B61D17/00 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
B61D17/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/45] |
Former [2000/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Krafteinleitung in ein in Faserverbundbauweise hergestelltes Bauteil | [2000/09] | English: | Device for force introduction into a component constructed of composite fibres | [2000/09] | French: | Dispositif pour l'introduction d'efforts dans un élément construit de fibres composites | [2000/09] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/22] | 22.12.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.10.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.10.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.10.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.10.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.10.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.10.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.10.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 09.10.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.10.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.10.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 09.10.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.10.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.10.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.10.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.10.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.10.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.10.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.10.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.10.2000 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0577940 (INVENTIO AG [CH]) [A] 1,6-10 * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 58; figures 1,5 *; | [A]WO9637400 (NOVAMAX TECH HOLDINGS [CA]) [A] 1,6-10 * page 5, line 15 - page 7, paragraph 1; figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE8915724U (G. FINKENSIEP) [A] 1,6-10 * page 3, line 26 - page 5, line 8; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | EP0687611 |