EP0901895 - Drilling device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft 9494 Schaan / LI | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft 9494 Schaan / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ostermeier, Peter Ahornweg 4 86911 Diessen / DE | 02 /
Golubovic, Goran Jahnstrasse 27 80469 München / DE | 03 /
Büchel, Benno Rotengasse 127 9491 Ruggell / FI | 04 /
Fritz, Mark Rheinstrasse 27b 6841 Mäder / AT | [1999/11] | Representative(s) | Wildi, Roland, et al Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung 9494 Schaan / LI | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | Wildi, Roland, et al Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung 9494 Schaan / LI | Application number, filing date | 98810874.2 | 02.09.1998 | [1999/11] | Priority number, date | DE19971040462 | 15.09.1997 Original published format: DE 19740462 | [1999/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0901895 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0901895 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B28D1/14, B23B41/00 | [1999/11] | CPC: |
B23Q1/54 (EP,US);
B28D1/041 (EP,KR,US);
B23B45/00 (KR);
B23Q5/04 (KR);
Y10T408/23 (EP,US);
Y10T408/65 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/48] |
Former [1999/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bohrgerät | [1999/11] | English: | Drilling device | [1999/11] | French: | Machine de forage | [1999/11] | Examination procedure | 17.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 19.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5316419 (BOHNET HARTMUT [DE], et al) [A] 1* claim 1 * | Examination | US4487275 |