Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
10.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] |
17.09.2003 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
17.09.2003 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
18.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
29.05.2003 | Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) | |
29.05.2003 | Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973) | |
23.05.2003 | Definitive list of designations | published on 09.07.2003 [2003/28] |
03.12.2002 | Surcharge for renewal fee | |
30.08.2002 | Publication of search report | published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] |
30.08.2001 | Renewal fee | |
05.09.2000 | Renewal fee | |
26.02.1999 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.04.1999 [1999/15] |