Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU735026B | Global Dossier | 28.06.2001 | B2 | AU8844498 | 29.04.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | CH238897 | 13.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0908252 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2002 | A3 | EP0908252 | 14.04.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CH238897 | 13.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE29815312U | 26.11.1998 | U1 | Priority number | Date | CH238897 | 13.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL328559 | 26.04.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH238897 | 13.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6142022 | 07.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | CH238897 | 13.10.1997 |