Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1002496 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2003 | B1 | EP1002496 | 24.05.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP98811141 | 17.11.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE236571T | 15.04.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP98811141 | 17.11.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59807889D1 | 15.05.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP98811141 | 17.11.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1002496T | 28.07.2003 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP98811141 | 17.11.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2197446T | 01.01.2004 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP98811141 | 17.11.1998 |