EP1002496 - Method and device for remote monitoring of body functions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.03.2004 [2004/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schiller AG Altgasse 68 6340 Baar / CH | [2000/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schiller, Alfred E. Steinenstückiweg 8914 Aeugst a. A / CH | 02 /
Schmid, Johann-Jakob Jonentalstrasse 1 8911 Rifferswil / CH | [2003/13] |
Former [2000/21] | 01 /
Schiller, Alfred E. Steinenstückiweg 8914 Aeugst a. A / CH | ||
02 /
Schmid, Johan-Jakob Jonentalstrasse 1 8911 Rifferswil / CH | Representative(s) | Hepp, Dieter, et al Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | Hepp, Dieter, et al Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG, Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | Application number, filing date | 98811141.5 | 17.11.1998 | [2000/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1002496 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1002496 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
A61B5/0002 (EP);
A61B5/7232 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2001/05] |
Former [2000/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Fernüberwachung von Körperfunktionen | [2002/47] | English: | Method and device for remote monitoring of body functions | [2000/21] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de surveillance à distance de fonctions corporelles | [2000/21] |
Former [2000/21] | Verfaheren und Vorrichtung zur Fernüberwachung von Körperfunktionen | Examination procedure | 18.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 25.11.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT | 19.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.12.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2727850 (ELA MEDICAL SA [FR]) [A] 4,6-9 * page 2, line 31 - page 4, line 11 * * page 5, line 16 - page 8, line 33; figure 1; claim - *; | [X]US5544661 (DAVIS CHARLES L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,12,15,16 * column 2, line 56 - column 4, line 21; figure - * * abstract *; | [X]WO9728736 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al) [X] 1-3,6,12,13,15,16 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0790034 (TAVORI ITZHAK [IL]) [X] 1-3,6-10,12,13,15,16 * column 6, line 58 - column 10, line 47; figure -; claim - *; | [A]WO9748244 (NEDERLAND PTT [NL]) [A] 1-3,11-13* the whole document *; | [X]WO9749077 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,10,12,13,15,16 * page 2, line 21 - page 3, line 30 * * page 7, line 1 - page 11, line 19; figure -; claim - *; | [X]DE19707681 (ERBEL RAIMUND PROF DR MED [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,8,12,13 * column 2, line 8 - column 4, line 15; figure -; claim - *; | [X]EP0846440 (SARCOS INC [US]) [X] 1-4,6-9,12,13,15,16 * column 7, line 32 - column 8, line 55 * * column 18, line 45 - column 19, line 25; figure - * |