EP0926209 - Aqueous dye solutions and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2003 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | [1999/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lacroix, Roger Rue Vauban 24 68300 Village-Neuf / FR | 02 /
Adam, Jean-Marie Rue de Village-Neuf 60 D 68300 Rosenau / FR | [1999/26] | Application number, filing date | 98811193.6 | 01.12.1998 | [1999/26] | Priority number, date | EP19970810962 | 10.12.1997 Original published format: EP 97810962 | [1999/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0926209 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0926209 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/26, C09B1/34, C09B69/04, D06P3/06, C09B67/22 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
D06P3/06 (EP);
C09B1/343 (EP);
C09B67/0073 (EP);
C09B69/04 (EP);
D06P1/39 (EP);
D06P3/241 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT [2000/10] |
Former [1999/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wässrige Farbstofflösungen und deren Verwendung | [1999/26] | English: | Aqueous dye solutions and their use | [1999/26] | French: | Solutions aqueuses de colorants er leur utilisation | [1999/26] | Examination procedure | 16.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 17.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 22.01.2003 | NL | 22.01.2003 | DK | 22.04.2003 | PT | 22.04.2003 | ES | 30.07.2003 | [2008/15] |
Former [2004/04] | NL | 22.01.2003 | |
DK | 22.04.2003 | ||
PT | 22.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | NL | 22.01.2003 | |
DK | 22.04.2003 | ||
PT | 22.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | NL | 22.01.2003 | |
PT | 22.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | NL | 22.01.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2236542 (SANDOZ LTD) [X] 1-15 * page 7, line 14 - line 23 * * page 9 - paragraph L * * page 15; figures 1C-2C *; | [Y]US4014646 (TULLIO VICTOR) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0387201 (CIBA GEIGY AG) [Y] 1-15 * page 2, line 50 - page 4, line 20 *; | [Y]US2314356 (H.R LEE ET AL) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]FR2270306 (BAYER AG) [Y] 1-15 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line L; example 5 *; | [Y]FR2294215 (HOECHST AG) [Y] 1,2 * page 2, line 27 - line 36; example 1 *; | [A]FR2320335 (BAYER AG) [A] 1-15 * page 4, line 9 - line 30; example 2 *; | [A]BE631379 (BASF) [A] 1-15 * page 2, paragraph L - page 4, line 2; example 1 *; | [A]FR2240940 (BAYER) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 8 - line 21; example 18 * |