Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0925783 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2004 | B1 | EP0925783 | 30.06.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH288497 | 16.12.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE262886T | 15.04.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | CH288497 | 16.12.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CH692238 | 15.04.2002 | A5 | Priority number | Date | CH288497 | 16.12.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59811094D1 | 06.05.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | CH288497 | 16.12.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2219863T | 01.12.2004 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CH288497 | 16.12.1997 |