EP0925783 - Skin protection preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spirig Pharma AG Froschackerstrasse 6 4622 Egerkingen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states Spirig Pharma AG Froschackerstrasse 6 CH-4622 Egerkingen / CH | ||
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states SPIRIG AG PHARMAZEUTISCHE PRÄPARATE Froschacker 434 CH-4622 Egerkingen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Birrenbach, Gerd, Dr. Weidweg 693 4616 Kappel / CH | 02 /
Gabard, Bernard, Dr. Kanzelstrasse 4622 Egerkingen / CH | [1999/26] | Representative(s) | Hoechst, Bruno Werner Bohest AG Holbeinstrasse 36-38 4051 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Hoechst, Bruno Werner BOHEST AG Postfach 160 4003 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2005/29] | Hoechst, Werner, Dr. Braun, Héritier, Eschmann AG Holbeinstrasse 36-38 4051 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1999/26] | Braun, André BRAUN & PARTNER Patent-, Marken-, Rechtsanwälte Reussstrasse 22 4054 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 98811237.1 | 16.12.1998 | [1999/26] | Priority number, date | CH19970002884 | 16.12.1997 Original published format: CH 288497 | [1999/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0925783 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0925783 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48, A61K7/40 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
A61K8/31 (EP);
A61K8/26 (EP);
A61K8/37 (EP);
A61P17/16 (EP);
A61Q17/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/26] | Extension states | LT | 30.12.1999 | LV | 30.12.1999 | RO | 30.12.1999 | Title | German: | Hautschutzzubereitung | [1999/26] | English: | Skin protection preparation | [1999/26] | French: | Préparation pour la protection de la peau | [1999/26] | Examination procedure | 30.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 04.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.12.2004
28.12.2004
ADMISSIBLE HENKEL KGaA VTP (Patente) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 02
24.12.2004
ADMISSIBLE BEIERSDORF AG Unnastrasse 48 20253 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.12.2004
28.12.2004
ADMISSIBLE Henkel KGaA VTP (Patente) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
24.12.2004
ADMISSIBLE Beiersdorf AG Unnastrasse 48 20253 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2005/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.12.2004
ADMISSIBLE Henkel KGaA VTP (Patente) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 04.02.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.08.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.03.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.03.2007 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2007/42] | 21.05.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 21.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 31.03.2004 | FI | 31.03.2004 | GB | 31.03.2004 | IE | 31.03.2004 | NL | 31.03.2004 | DK | 30.06.2004 | GR | 30.06.2004 | SE | 30.06.2004 | PT | 31.08.2004 | AT | 16.12.2004 | LU | 16.12.2004 | BE | 31.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | [2008/15] |
Former [2007/17] | CY | 31.03.2004 | |
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
GB | 31.03.2004 | ||
IE | 31.03.2004 | ||
NL | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
AT | 16.12.2004 | ||
LU | 16.12.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/34] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
GB | 31.03.2004 | ||
IE | 31.03.2004 | ||
NL | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
AT | 16.12.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
GB | 31.03.2004 | ||
IE | 31.03.2004 | ||
NL | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
GB | 31.03.2004 | ||
IE | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
GB | 31.03.2004 | ||
IE | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
GB | 31.03.2004 | ||
IE | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
GB | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
GB | 31.03.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
SE | 30.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB903407 (UPJOHN CO) [X] 1-4,6,11-14,17,18 * claims 1,2 * * page 2, lines 1-13 * * page 2, lines 96-114 ** example 1 *; | [X]FR1338860 (MINISTERUL IND PETROLULUI) [X] 1-4,6,7,11-14,17,18 * claims 1,2 * * page 1, column 2 * * page 2, column 1 *; | [X]US4551330 (WAGMAN JULIUS [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,9,12-14,17,18 * claims 1,2,6,8,11 * * column 4, lines 40-60 * * column 5, lines 56-58 * * column 6, lines 46-47 *; | [X]WO9619183 (COSMEDERM TECHNOLOGIES [US], et al) [X] 1,2,11-14,17,18 * claims 1,6,10,36,52,53,57,64,69 * * page 2, lines 18-22 * * page 3, lines 20-26 * * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 19 * * page 15, lines 6-19 * * page 21, line 14 - page 22, line 4 * * page 26, line 13 - page 27, line 10 * * page 19, lines 5-23 * * page 20, line 18 - page 21, line 9 * |