EP0863374 - Solid refrigerant reservoir for isothermal containers, particularly for the transportation of products under controlled temperature [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2000 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MONETTI S.p.A. Corso Principi di Piemonte 61 12035 Racconigi (Cuneo) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/37] | For all designated states MONETTI S.p.A. Corso Principi di Piemonte 61 I-12035 Racconigi (Cuneo) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Monetti, Giovanni Via Valcrosa, 11 12030 Manta di Saluzzo (Cuneo) / IT | [1998/37] | Representative(s) | Buzzi, Franco, et al Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Buzzi, Franco, et al c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | ||
Former [1998/37] | Buzzi, Franco, et al c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Srl, Corso Fiume, 6 10133 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 98830085.1 | 20.02.1998 | [1998/37] | Priority number, date | IT1997TO00179 | 05.03.1997 Original published format: IT TO970179 | [1998/37] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0863374 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0863374 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | [1998/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F25D3/12 | [1998/37] | CPC: |
F25D3/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [1999/22] |
Former [1998/37] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gefäss mit festem Kältemittel für isothermische Behälter, insbesondere für den Warentransport mit überwachter Temperatur | [1998/37] | English: | Solid refrigerant reservoir for isothermal containers, particularly for the transportation of products under controlled temperature | [1998/37] | French: | Récipient à réfrigérant solide pour conteneurs isothermes, notamment pour le transport à température contrôlée de produits | [1998/37] | Examination procedure | 24.03.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/10] | 04.10.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.06.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.1999 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.1999 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.06.1999 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5363670 (BARTILUCCI ANTHONY [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 5, line 30 - column 12, line 18 *; | [A]US1893483 (BELT JOSEPH S) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 * * page 1, line 73 - page 2, line 126 *; | [A]FR995434 (GRENIER M) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1024493 (JOUBERT R G C) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP0823600 (OLIVO [FR]) [PA] 1 * abstract * * column 4, line 33 - column 8, line 58 * | by applicant | EP0337860 | EP0631096 |