EP0867210 - Coupon or similar element arranged to conceal one message to be deliberately unhidden and a process for accomplishment of same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graphicpoint S.p.A. Via Abbondio Sangiorgio, 12 20145 Milano / IT | [1998/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Annesini, Monica Via Aicardo, 2 20141 Milano / IT | [1998/40] | Representative(s) | Righetti, Giuseppe Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti, 17 20158 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/40] | Righetti, Giuseppe Bugnion S.p.A. Via Carlo Farini, 81 20159 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 98830182.6 | 26.03.1998 | [1998/40] | Priority number, date | IT1997MI00720 | 27.03.1997 Original published format: IT MI970720 | [1998/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0867210 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0867210 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A63F3/06 | [1998/40] | CPC: |
A63F3/069 (EP);
A63F3/0665 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2001/50] |
Former [1998/40] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zum Verbergen einer absichtlich sichtbar zu machenden Nachricht ausgebildeter Coupon oder ähnliches Element und Verfahren seiner Herstellung | [1998/40] | English: | Coupon or similar element arranged to conceal one message to be deliberately unhidden and a process for accomplishment of same | [1998/40] | French: | Coupon ou élement similaire agencé de manière à cacher un message qui peut être rendu visible délibérément, et son procédé de réalisation | [1998/40] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/25] | 17.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 31.10.2001 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3900219 (D AMATO SALVATORE F, et al) [X] 1-3,7,11-13,17 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 31; figure - * [A] 4-6,8-10,12-16,18,19; | [X]GB2133993 (SCHWEGLER KARL AG) [X] 1,6,7,11,16,17 * page 1, line 31 - line 85; figure - *; | [X]US4740016 (KONECNY GEORGE [CA], et al) [X] 1,6,7,11,16,17 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 4; figure - *; | [A]US4033611 (JOHNSEN EDWARD L) [A] 1,10 * the whole document * |