EP0877351 - Hooking device for windable boards, particularly for information displayers with interchangeable boards [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.12.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states New Board International Ltd. 4th Floor, 315 Oxford Street London W1 R1LA / GB | [1998/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Flammini, Fausto New Board International Ltd., 315 Oxford Street London W1, R1LA / GB | [1998/46] | Representative(s) | Iannone, Carlo Luigi, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/46] | Iannone, Carlo Luigi, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte, 26 00187 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 98830273.3 | 06.05.1998 | [1998/46] | Priority number, date | IT1997RM00273 | 09.05.1997 Original published format: IT RM970273 | [1998/46] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0877351 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0877351 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0877351 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G09F11/32, G09F11/30 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
G09F11/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/46] | G09F11/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/46] | Title | German: | Anhängungsvorrichtung für aufrollbaren Tafeln, insbesondere für Informationsanzeigevorrichtungen mit auswechselbaren Tafeln | [1998/46] | English: | Hooking device for windable boards, particularly for information displayers with interchangeable boards | [1998/46] | French: | Dispositif d'accrochage pour panneaux enroulables, en particulier pour dispositifs de présentation d'informations à planches interchangeables | [1998/46] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/30] | 30.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.02.2004 | CH | 11.02.2004 | CY | 11.02.2004 | FI | 11.02.2004 | LI | 11.02.2004 | NL | 11.02.2004 | IE | 06.05.2004 | LU | 06.05.2004 | DK | 11.05.2004 | GR | 11.05.2004 | SE | 11.05.2004 | MC | 31.05.2004 | [2013/11] |
Former [2007/17] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
CH | 11.02.2004 | ||
CY | 11.02.2004 | ||
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
LI | 11.02.2004 | ||
NL | 11.02.2004 | ||
IE | 06.05.2004 | ||
LU | 06.05.2004 | ||
DK | 11.05.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
CH | 11.02.2004 | ||
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
LI | 11.02.2004 | ||
NL | 11.02.2004 | ||
IE | 06.05.2004 | ||
LU | 06.05.2004 | ||
DK | 11.05.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
CH | 11.02.2004 | ||
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
LI | 11.02.2004 | ||
IE | 06.05.2004 | ||
LU | 06.05.2004 | ||
DK | 11.05.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
CH | 11.02.2004 | ||
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
LI | 11.02.2004 | ||
LU | 06.05.2004 | ||
DK | 11.05.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
CH | 11.02.2004 | ||
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
LI | 11.02.2004 | ||
DK | 11.05.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
CH | 11.02.2004 | ||
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
LI | 11.02.2004 | ||
DK | 11.05.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
CH | 11.02.2004 | ||
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
LI | 11.02.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 11.02.2004 | |
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 11.02.2004 | |
SE | 11.05.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2195249 (JOB HUTCHINSON) [A] 1,3-5 * page 1, column L, line 26 - line 31 * * page 1, column R, line 28 - line 32 * * page 2, column L, line 4 - line 15 * * page 3, line 26 - line 34 * * figures 4,6,10 *; | [A]EP0287268 (JEWELL POSTER MACHINES [GB]) [A] 1,3-6 * column 1, line 1 - line 51 * * column 4, line 1 - line 6 * * column 5, line 2 - line 14 * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]DE3826478 (BRISCOE DAVID [DE]) [A] 1,3-5 * column 2, line 8 - line 45; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9519618 (ROLLERBOARD [FR], et al) [A] 1,3-5 * page 4, line 26 - line 35 * * page 5, line 1 - line 12 ** figure 3 * |