blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0879993

EP0879993 - A cylindrical gas burner [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.01.2004
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 02.06.2004  [2004/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WORGAS BRUCIATORI S.R.L.
Via A. Coppi, 17 41043 Formigine
Modena / IT
[N/P]
Former [1998/48]For all designated states
WORGAS BRUCIATORI S.R.L.
Via A. Coppi, 17
I-41043 Formigine, Modena / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Lasagni, Feliciano
Via Libertà, 826
41058 Vignola, (Modena) / IT
[1998/48]
Representative(s)Lanzoni, Luciano
Bugnion S.p.A.
Via di Corticella, 87
40128 Bologna / IT
[N/P]
Former [1998/48]Lanzoni, Luciano
c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Via dei Mille, 19
40121 Bologna / IT
Application number, filing date98830315.221.05.1998
[1998/48]
Priority number, dateIT1997BO0031123.05.1997         Original published format: IT BO970311
[1998/48]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0879993
Date:25.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0879993
Date:16.06.1999
[1999/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0879993
Date:19.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.05.1999
ClassificationIPC:F23D14/10, F23D14/02, F23D14/46
[1999/24]
CPC:
F23D14/105 (EP,US); F23D2203/1012 (EP,US); F23D2203/102 (EP,US);
F23D2900/00003 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1998/48]F23D14/10
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/08]
Former [1998/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ein zylindrischer Gasbrenner[1998/48]
English:A cylindrical gas burner[1998/48]
French:Brûleur à gaz cylindrique[1998/48]
Examination procedure10.08.1999Examination requested  [1999/40]
27.12.1999Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
24.03.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE
18.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.12.2002Fee for grant paid
10.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.12.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
29.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
13.01.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
13.01.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE19.03.2003
NL19.03.2003
DK19.06.2003
ES30.09.2003
[2004/23]
Former [2004/10]BE19.03.2003
NL19.03.2003
ES30.09.2003
Former [2004/04]NL19.03.2003
ES30.09.2003
Former [2003/41]NL19.03.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0239189  (LOCHINVAR WATER HEATER CORP [US]) [A] 4,7,10 * page 11, paragraph 2 - page 12, paragraph 2 * * page 14, paragraph 2; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]DE9201313U  (HOVAL INTERLIZ) [A] 1,11 * page 3, line 34 - page 4, line 15 * * page 5, line 11 - line 17 * * figure . *;
 [A]DE9102991U  (HANS VIESSMANN);
 [A]WO9416269  (LE MER JOSEPH [FR]) [A] 1,11 * page 15, line 31 - page 16, line 16; figures 15-18 *;
 [A]DE29510374U  (FURIGAS ASSEN BV [NL]) [A] 1,11 * page 8, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]DE19533906  (BUDERUS HEIZTECHNIK GMBH [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.