EP0966988 - Apparatus and method for interfering with pathological cells survival [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2001 [2001/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tofani, Santi Via Bruetto, 18 10010 Burolo (TO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/52] | For all designated states Tofani, Santi Via Bruetto, 18 10010 Burolo (To) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/52] | Representative(s) | Celestino, Marco, et al ABM Agenzia Brevetti & Marchi, Viale Giovanni Pisano, 31 56123 Pisa / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/52] | Celestino, Marco, et al ABM, Agenzia Brevetti & Marchi, Via A. Della Spina 40 56125 Pisa / IT | Application number, filing date | 98830381.4 | 24.06.1998 | [1999/52] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0966988 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61N2/02 | [1999/52] | CPC: |
A61N2/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2000/36] |
Former [1999/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gerät und Verfahren zum Stören des überlebens pathologischer Zellen | [1999/52] | English: | Apparatus and method for interfering with pathological cells survival | [1999/52] | French: | Appareil et méthode permettant d'empêcher la survie de cellules pathologiques | [1999/52] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/10] | 12.10.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.08.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.08.2000 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE3911393 (KRAUS WERNER [DE]) [X] 3,5,9,10 * column W * [A] 1,6,7,12,13; | [A]DE4036770 (LIFE RESONANCES INC [US]) [A] 1-3,6-10,12,14 * page 3, line 17 - page 4, line 28 *; | [XA]US5156587 (MONTONE LIBER J [US]) [X] 3,5,9,10 * column 1, lines 10-21 * * column 2, lines 58-68 * * column 5, line 37 - column 6, line 16 * * column 10, lines 13-20 * [A] 1,7,12; | [XA]DE4122380 (KRAUS WERNER [DE]) [X] 3,5 * column 2, line 68 - column 3, line 22 * [A] 1,12; | [A]WO9639493 (US ENVIRONMENT [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5-7,9,10,12,13 * page 27, line 13 - page 30, line 30 *; | [A]WO9704830 (GRAY JAMES R [US]) [A] 2,4,8,11,12,14 * page 10, lines 18-21 * * page 15, lines 8-16 * * page 44, line 19 - page 47, line 12 ** page 52, line 15 - page 54, line 6 *; | [A]US5691324 (SANDYK REUVEN [US]) [A] 1-4,6,8,9 * column 8, line 36 - column 9, line 27 * * column 11, lines 6-28 * * column 16, lines 9-22 * * column 17, line 52 - column 18, line 33 *; | [AD] - TOFANI S;, FERRARA A, ANGLESIO L, GILLI G, "evidence for genotoxic effects of resonant elf magnetic fields", BIOELECTROCHEMISTRY AND BIOENERGETICS, (1995), no. 36, page 9-13, XP002084038 [AD] 1-3,5,6,9,10,12,13 * column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0302-4598(94)01722-D | by applicant | US4665898 |