blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0968767

EP0968767 - Spray pump for liquids [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.08.2003  [2003/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Guala Dispensing S.p.A.
Zona Industriale D/5, Spinetta Marengo
15047 Alessandria / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Guala Dispensing S.P.A.
Zona Industriale D/5, Spinetta Marengo
15047 Alessandria / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Gramola, Marco
Piazza San Guido, 6
15011 Acqui Terme - Alessandria / IT
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Siniscalco, Fabio, et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8
20121 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2002/16]Siniscalco, Fabio, et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8
20121 Milano / IT
Former [2000/01]Perani, Aurelio, et al
c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A Via Senato 8
20121 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date98830389.730.06.1998
[2000/01]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968767
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:B05B11/00
[2000/01]
CPC:
B05B11/0059 (EP); B05B11/1004 (EP); B05B11/1011 (EP);
B05B11/1016 (EP); B05B11/1095 (EP); B05B11/0062 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/37]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Zerstäubungspumpe für Flüssigkeiten[2000/01]
English:Spray pump for liquids[2000/01]
French:Pompe de pulvérisation pour liquides[2000/01]
Examination procedure11.03.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
06.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
12.10.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
20.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/33]
12.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
17.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
01.08.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[DX]US4277001  (NOZAWA TAKAMITSU) [DX] 1 * column W *;
 [A]US4591077  (CORSETTE DOUGLAS F [US]) [A] 5,6* the whole document *;
 [A]US4606480  (RODRIGUEZ GAZULLA FRANCISCO [ES]) [A] 3 * column 7, line 10 - line 13 *;
 [A]US5119974  (MANN FREDERICK J [US]) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]DE4411031  (MECKENSTOCK FRITZ GMBH [DE]) [A] 4,7-9 * figures 7-12 *;
 [A]US5738252  (DODD JOSEPH K [US], et al) [A] 1,4-9 * the whole document *
by applicantUS4161288
 US4277001
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.