Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0963902
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
08.12.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.01.2001 [2001/04] |
07.07.2000 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 23.08.2000 [2000/34] |
23.12.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] |
29.10.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.12.1999 [1999/50] |
29.10.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.12.1999 [1999/50] |
10.08.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.08.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
05.08.1999 |
Change - extension states |
|
05.08.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.07.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
08.07.1999 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|
03.03.1999 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|