blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0963902

EP0963902 - A bearing structure for vehicle fifth wheels [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2000
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.01.2001 [2001/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
V. Orlandi S.p.A.
Via Quinzano 3
25020 Flero (Brescia) / IT
[1999/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Inverardi, Angelo
Via Don L. Sturzo 82
25030 Lograto (Brescia) / IT
[1999/50]
Representative(s)Sutto, Luca
Gambro Intellectual Property Department
P.O. Box 98
41037 Mirandola (MO) / IT
[N/P]
Former [1999/50]Sutto, Luca
Bugnion S.p.A., Viale Lancetti, 19
20158 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date98830469.731.07.1998
[1999/50]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0963902
Date:15.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0963902
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.1999
ClassificationIPC:B62D53/08
[1999/50]
CPC:
B62D53/0807 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1999/50]
TitleGerman:Lagerstruktur für Sattelzugfahrzeug[1999/50]
English:A bearing structure for vehicle fifth wheels[1999/50]
French:Structure de palier pour sellette d'attelage de véhicule[1999/50]
Examination procedure15.02.1999Examination requested  [1999/50]
15.02.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
13.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.07.1999Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
30.07.1999Fee for grant paid
30.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/04]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0087903  (HOLLAND HITCH CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 8, line 16 - page 9, line 2; figure 2 *;
 [A]US4762334  (ALTHERR RUSSELL G [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 22 - line 30; figures 4,5 *;
 [A]US5639106  (VITALE FRANK [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 11 - line 22; figures 7,8 *
ExaminationEP0694467
by applicantEP0694967
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.