EP0978574 - Compositions of cationic surfactants and their use as antifouling agents for induced draft fans (IDF) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.08.2003 [2003/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NALCO CHEMICAL COMPANY One Nalco Center Naperville, IL 60563-1198 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | For all designated states NALCO CHEMICAL COMPANY One Nalco Center Naperville Illinois 60563-1198 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paolillo, Salvatore, c/o Nalco Italiana S.p.A. Viale dell'Esperanto, 71 00144 Roma / IT | 02 /
Parri, Giuseppe, c/o Nalco Italiana S.p.A. Viale dell'Esperanto, 71 00144 Roma / IT | 03 /
Ricciardi, Francesco, Nalco Italiana S.p.A. Viale dell'Esperanto, 71 00144 Roma / IT | [2000/06] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 98830477.0 | 04.08.1998 | [2000/06] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0978574 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C23F15/00 | [2000/06] | CPC: |
C21C5/38 (EP);
C11D3/02 (KR);
C23F15/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/42] |
Former [2000/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zusammensetzungen von kationische Tenside und deren Verwendung als verschmutzungsverhindernde Substanzen für Gebläse mit erzwungenen Abzug | [2000/06] | English: | Compositions of cationic surfactants and their use as antifouling agents for induced draft fans (IDF) | [2000/06] | French: | Compositions de surfactifs cationiques et leur utilisation comme agents antisalissures pour ventilateurs à tirage forcé | [2000/06] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 10.08.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.08.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 21.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LI | 04.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.09.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19648888 (REMMERS BAUCHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,13 * page 3, line 32; claim 3 *; | [X]EP0328335 (WAITOMO IND INVESTMENTS LTD [CA]) [X] 1-4,7,13 * examples 1,9 *; | [X]FR2354376 (ICI LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,4,8,13 * page 8, lines 10-12 *; | [X]US4000077 (WIXON HAROLD EUGENE) [X] 1,5,9-11,13 * column 4, lines 14-16 * * column 2, lines 16-25 *; | [X]EP0277060 (RAFFINAGE CIE FRANCAISE [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,13 * table 1 *; | [X]EP0418986 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [X] 1,2,5,9,13 * page 5, column 52; claim 4 *; | [X]GB2131693 (OREAL) [X] 1,2,5,13 * page 2, lines 56-61 *; | [A]US5437712 (KLATSKIN STUART D [US], et al) [A] 14 * claim 1 *; | [A]US3887340 (HSU YUAN TSUN, et al) [A] 14 * claim 1 *; | [A]JPH07268246 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 50, Database accession no. 95-390467, XP002088337 & JPH07268246 A 19951017 (SANYO CHEM IND LTD) [A] 14 * abstract * |