blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0982085

EP0982085 - Punching machine and relative punching system comprising a tool store [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.01.2002
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2008Change - representativepublished on 05.11.2008  [2008/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RAINER S.r.l.
Via Ottavio Serra, 3
I-40012 Calderara di Reno (Bologna) / IT
[2000/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Perazzolo, Eugenio
Via Veronese, 15
45100 Rovigo / IT
[2000/09]
Representative(s)Jorio, Paolo, et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2008/45]Jorio, Paolo, et al
STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9
10121 Torino / IT
Former [2000/09]Jorio, Paolo, et al
STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date98830513.227.08.1998
[2000/09]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0982085
Date:01.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0982085
Date:15.03.2000
[2000/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.02.2000
ClassificationIPC:B21D28/00, B21D28/12, B21D37/14, G05B19/12, B23Q17/00
[2000/09]
CPC:
G05B19/12 (EP); B21D28/12 (EP); B21D37/14 (EP);
B21D37/145 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   IT [2000/47]
Former [2000/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Stanzmaschine und Stanzsystem mit Werkzeugmagazin[2000/09]
English:Punching machine and relative punching system comprising a tool store[2000/09]
French:Dispositif et système de poinçonnage pourvu d' un magasin d' outils[2000/09]
Examination procedure28.08.1999Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
07.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/42]
16.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.03.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
27.06.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/09]
08.08.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
06.11.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
06.11.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
06.11.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
06.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
06.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
06.11.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
06.11.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
06.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
06.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
06.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
06.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
06.11.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
06.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
06.11.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0600672  (APIC YAMADA CORP) [X] 1,15,16 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 28; figure - * [A] 3;
 [A]JPS63230235  ;
 [A]DE4401610  (AMADA MFG AMERICA) [A] 1,14 * figure - *;
 [A]JPH04367332  ;
 [A]JPH04365538  ;
 [A]JPH04360757  ;
 [A]JPH02247026  ;
 [A]JPH04336985
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890118), vol. 013, no. 020, Database accession no. (M - 785), & JP63230235 A 19880926 (AMADA CO LTD) [A] 2,3 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930517), vol. 017, no. 244, Database accession no. (M - 1410), & JP04367332 A 19921218 (AMADA CO LTD) [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930514), vol. 017, no. 240, Database accession no. (M - 1409), & JP04365538 A 19921217 (AMADA CO LTD) [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930511), vol. 017, no. 229, Database accession no. (M - 1406), & JP04360757 A 19921214 (AMADA CO LTD) [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901219), vol. 014, no. 572, Database accession no. (M - 1061), & JP02247026 A 19901002 (AMADA CO LTD) [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930412), vol. 017, no. 186, Database accession no. (M - 1395), & JP04336985 A 19921125 (AMADA CO LTD) [A] * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.