blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0911014

EP0911014 - A surgery furniture unit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.08.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.10.2004  [2004/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CASTELLINI S.p.A.
Via Saliceto, 22
I-40013 Castel Maggiore (Bologna) / IT
[N/P]
Former [1999/17]For all designated states
CASTELLINI S.p.A.
Via Saliceto, 22
I-40013 Castelmaggiore (Bologna) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Castellini, Franco
Piazza del Francia, 1
40124 Bologna / IT
[1999/17]
Representative(s)Lanzoni, Luciano
Bugnion S.p.A.
Via di Corticella, 87
40128 Bologna / IT
[N/P]
Former [1999/17]Lanzoni, Luciano
c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Via Goito, 18
40126 Bologna / IT
Application number, filing date98830605.613.10.1998
[1999/17]
Priority number, dateIT1997BO0061915.10.1997         Original published format: IT BO970619
[1999/17]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0911014
Date:28.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0911014
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:A61G15/14, A61B19/02, E06B9/11
[2000/03]
CPC:
E06B9/115 (EP); A61B50/10 (EP); A61G15/14 (EP);
A61B2050/105 (EP)
Former IPC [1999/17]A61G15/14, A61B19/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/39]
Former [1999/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Möbel für Chirurgie[1999/17]
English:A surgery furniture unit[1999/17]
French:Meuble pour chirurgie[1999/17]
Examination procedure30.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
20.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
20.10.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
24.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/42]
12.05.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
14.08.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
14.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
14.08.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
14.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
14.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
14.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
14.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
14.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
14.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
14.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
14.08.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
14.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
14.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE801651  (MAUSER KOMM GES) [A] 3 * figure -; claim 1 *;
 [Y]US3129040  (DE ROSE JAMES) [Y] 1,2,5,6,8-10,14,17 * column 2, line 7 - column 4, line 36; figures 1-8 *;
 [A]DE1255258  (KINNARPS KONTORMOEBLER) [A] 18,19* column 1, line 17 - line 29; figure - *;
 [YA]US3837041  (MODERT E, et al) [Y] 1,2,5,6,8-10,14,17 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 6; figure 1 * [A] 15;
 [A]FR2389366  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,18,20-22 * page 4, line 7 - line 10 * * page 4, line 23 - page 5, line 24 * * page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 23; figures 2,3,6 *;
 [A]IT1153681  (DENTONI GIOVANNI) [A] 11 * page 2, line 21 - page 3, line 2; figure 3 *;
 [A]DE9111491U  (BAUER-ORGANISATION KG STAHLMÖBELFABRIK) [A] 16 * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 6 * * page 4, line 11 - line 13; figure 4 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.