EP0965455 - Direct electrostatic printing method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2001 [2001/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARRAY PRINTERS AB Önnereds Brygga 13 421 57 Västra Frölunda / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | For all designated states ARRAY PRINTERS AB Önnereds Brygga 13 S-421 57 Västra Frölunda / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jonsson, Tomas Bisittaregatan 5 431 34 Mölndal / SE | [1999/51] | Representative(s) | Cederbom, Hans Erik August Cegumark AB Box 53047 400 14 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | Cederbom, Hans Erik August Cegumark AB, Box 53047 400 14 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [1999/51] | Mossmark, Anders Albihns Patentbyra Göteborg AB P.O.Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 98850107.8 | 15.06.1998 | [1999/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0965455 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/415, G03G15/34 | [1999/51] | CPC: |
B41J2/4155 (EP,US);
G03G15/346 (EP,US);
G03G2217/0025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/51] | Extension states | AL | 05.06.2000 | LT | 05.06.2000 | LV | 05.06.2000 | RO | 05.06.2000 | SI | 05.06.2000 | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät für direktes elektrostatisches Drucken | [1999/51] | English: | Direct electrostatic printing method and apparatus | [1999/51] | French: | Méthode et appareil d'impression électrostatique directe | [1999/51] | Examination procedure | 09.07.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 10.07.1998 | Examination requested [1999/51] | 12.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 24.04.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/46] | 01.06.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5193011 (DIR GARY A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-11,20,28 * column 6, line 50 - column 7, line 55; figures 3A,3B * [A] 12-15; | [X]DE19718757 (ARRAY PRINTERS AB [SE]) [X] 1-4,28 * column 2, line 46 - column 4, line 57; figures 1-4 *; | [X]EP0795792 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [X] 1-3,5-9,20,25,28 * column 5, line 46 - column 6, line 50; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0844095 (SHIOZAKI EINI [JP]) [A] 1,21,22,24,27 * column 14, line 47 - column 15, line 21; figures 1,17,18,22 *; | [DA]WO9735725 (ARRAY PRINTERS AB [SE]) [DA] 1,19,20 * abstract *; | [A]EP0816944 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [A] 1,28 * page 2, line 35 - line 46 *; | [A]EP0736822 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [A] 1,28 * page 2, line 50 - page 3, line 18 *; | [A]US5477250 (LARSON OVE [SE]) [A] 1,25-27 * column A; figures 1,8 * | [A] - SCHMIDLIN F, "PREFIX DEP", XEROX DISCLOSURE JOURNAL, (19910101), vol. 16, no. 1, page 15, XP000167942 [A] 1,23 |