EP0958837 - Perfume dispenser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Generet, Daniel Rue de Scoumont 39 6230 Obaix / BE | [1999/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/47] | Representative(s) | Vandeberg, Marie-Paule L.G., et al Office Kirkpatrick 32, avenue Wolfers 1310 La Hulpe / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Vandeberg, Marie-Paule L.G., et al Office Kirkpatrick 32, avenue Wolfers 1310 La Hulpe / BE | ||
Former [2000/39] | Vandeberg, Marie-Paule L.G., et al Office Kirkpatrick S.A., 32, Avenue Wolfers 1310 La Hulpe / BE | ||
Former [1999/47] | Bairiot-Delcoux, Mariette Office Kirkpatrick S.A., Avenue Wolfers, 32 1310 La Hulpe / BE | Application number, filing date | 98870117.3 | 20.05.1998 | [1999/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0958837 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61L9/04, A61L9/12 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
A61L9/12 (EP);
A61L9/044 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL [2000/34] |
Former [2000/31] | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL | ||
Former [1999/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Parfümspender | [1999/47] | English: | Perfume dispenser | [1999/47] | French: | Dispositif diffuseur de parfum | [1999/47] | Examination procedure | 22.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/30] | 04.12.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/25] | 18.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5702780 (GRUNDEL LOUIS GEORGE ET AL) [X] 1-5 * claims 1,10,14 *; | [X]EP0134360 (LAIRE INC DE) [X] 1-5 * page 10, line 11 - line 19; figure 1 * * claims 1,2,4,5 *; | [XY]US4181255 (CORT J GEORGE) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 11 - column 3, line 49 * * figure 1 * [Y] 6-8; | [Y]GB1417954 (SHELL INT RESEARCH) [Y] 6,7 * page 2, column L, line 33 - column R, line 122 * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US4869407 (BOOTH JR ALFRED E ET AL) [Y] 8 * column 4, line 32 - line 44 * * figure 7 *; | [A]US4931258 (ZLOTNIK ARNOLD ET AL) [A] 1-8 * abstract * |