21.07.2017 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] |
04.05.2012 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] |
13.04.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.05.2012 [2012/20] |
17.06.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] |
10.06.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] |
20.05.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] |
01.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] |
27.08.2010 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] |
11.06.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] |
01.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] |
01.01.2010 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] |
23.01.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] |
21.01.2009 |
Deletion: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.01.2009 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
11.09.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.08.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.12.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.12.2006 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
08.12.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.09.2006 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
14.07.2006 |
First examination report |
|
12.07.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.02.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.02.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
14.10.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.08.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.09.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.08.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.08.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
26.11.2001 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
26.11.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.10.2001 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
16.11.2000 |
Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973) |
|
14.11.2000 |
Change - extension states |
|
03.11.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] |
31.10.2000 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
31.10.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.09.2000 |
Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973) |
|
28.09.2000 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
15.09.2000 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 02.11.2000 [2000/44] |
07.01.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.02.2000 [2000/08] |
27.10.1998 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|
05.10.1998 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|