EP0980954 - Security counter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2017 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states de Ceuster, Marcel P. Binckstraat 11 2260 Westerlo / BE | [2009/09] |
Former [2000/08] | For all designated states de Ceuster, Marcel P. Binckstraat 11 2260 Westerlo / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/08] | Application number, filing date | 98870179.3 | 14.08.1998 | [2000/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0980954 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0980954 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E05G7/00 | [2000/08] | CPC: |
E05G7/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/44] |
Former [2000/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sicherheits-Schaltertheke | [2000/08] | English: | Security counter | [2000/08] | French: | Guichet de sécurité | [2000/08] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/51] | 18.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.10.2000 | M01   Fee paid on   03.11.2000 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.10.2000 | 31.08.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   16.11.2001 | 31.08.2006 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   23.11.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 25.02.2009 | FI | 25.02.2009 | IE | 25.02.2009 | SE | 25.05.2009 | GR | 26.05.2009 | LU | 14.08.2009 | [2017/34] |
Former [2012/23] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
LU | 14.08.2009 | ||
Former [2012/20] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
IT | 14.08.2009 | ||
LU | 14.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/25] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
IT | 14.08.2009 | ||
LU | 14.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/39] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4135658 (HAGBERG BRUCE E) [A] 1,4 * column 4, line 10 - line 52 * * column 5, line 19 - line 65; figures 1-3,5 *; | [A]US4149474 (RUANE RICHARD M) [A] 1 * column 1, line 63 - line 66 ** column 2, line 25 - line 29; figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]FR2475614 (GERARD JEAN JACQUES [FR]) [A] 1,8 * page 1, line 32 - line 33 *; | [A]BE904844 (SPRL SERA) [A] 1,9,10,12 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 4, paragraph 5 - page 6, paragraph 2; figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]WO9417274 (HEMA BV [NL], et al) [A] 1 * page 7, line 21 * * page 8, line 35 - line 37; figures 1,7 * |