EP0971024 - Laundry and cleaning compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2001 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2001 [2001/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bettiol, Jean-Luc Philippe 93 Avenue Slegers 1200 Brussels / BE | 02 /
Busch, Alfred Handelsstraat 210 1840 Londerzeel / BE | 03 /
Denutte, Hugo Molenstraat 12 9308 Hofstade / BE | 04 /
Laudamiel, Christophe 20A Rue de la Violette 1000 Brussels / BE | 05 /
Smets, Johan Bollenberg 79 3210 Lubbeek / BE | [2000/02] | Representative(s) | Engisch, Gautier, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA IP Patent Department Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | Engisch, Gautier, et al BVBA Procter & Gamble Europe SPRL, Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 98870226.2 | 28.10.1998 | [2000/02] | Priority number, date | EP19980870155 | 10.07.1998 Original published format: EP 98870155 | [2000/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0971024 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/50, C11D3/00, C11D3/20, C11D3/30, C11D3/22, C11D3/37, C11D3/33 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
C11D3/3742 (EP,KR,US);
C11D3/26 (KR);
C11D17/0039 (EP,US);
C11D17/06 (EP,US);
C11D3/2072 (EP,US);
C11D3/2093 (EP,US);
C11D3/22 (EP,US);
C11D3/222 (KR);
C11D3/227 (EP,US);
C11D3/37 (EP,US);
C11D3/3723 (EP,US);
C11D3/50 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/38] |
Former [2000/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wasch- und Reinigungsmittel | [2000/02] | English: | Laundry and cleaning compositions | [2000/02] | French: | Compositions de blanchissage et de lavage | [2000/02] | Examination procedure | 13.07.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/17] | 24.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.09.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 15.09.2000 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0011499 (UNILEVER LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-3,5,9,15,16,20-23 * LF 165 *;; example -; claims 1-7,10,19,20,23 *; | [A]EP0430315 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-23 * example -; claim 1 *; | [X]USH1468H (COSTA JILL B [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,14,16,20-23 * column 4, line 39 - line 41; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0831143 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-24 * synthesis examples V-VIII *;; examples 1-4; claim - *; | [A] - KAMOGAWA H ET AL, "Chemical release control- Schiff bases of perfume aldehydes and aminostyrenes", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, POLYMER CHEMISTRY EDITION, (19820101), vol. 20, ISSN 0887-624X, pages 3121 - 3129, XP002084908 [A] 1 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pol.1982.170201108 | [A] - VIGUERA A -R ET AL, "A WATER-SOLUBLE POLYLYSINE-RETINALDEHYDE SCHIFF BASE. STABILITY IN AQUEOUS AND NANOQUEOUS ENVIRONMENTS", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19900215), vol. 265, no. 5, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 2527 - 2532, XP002057413 [A] 1 * page 2527, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2528, paragraph L - page 2529, paragraph 2 * |