EP0862255 - Disconnector for surge arrester [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2005 [2005/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FELTEN & GUILLEAUME AUSTRIA AG 3943 Schrems-Eugenia 1 / AT | [1998/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suchentrunk, Karl Ing Franz Kager Gasse 3 2435 Wienerherberg / AT | [1998/36] | Representative(s) | Gibler, Ferdinand Gibler & Poth Patentanwälte OG Dorotheergasse 7/14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/36] | Gibler, Ferdinand Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Ferdinand Gibler Dorotheergasse 7 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 98890032.0 | 11.02.1998 | [1998/36] | Priority number, date | AT19970000225 | 12.02.1997 Original published format: AT 22597 | [1998/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0862255 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H02H9/04, H02H3/04 | [1998/36] | CPC: |
H02H3/048 (EP);
H02H9/042 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GR, IT, NL, PT [1999/19] |
Former [1998/36] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ableitertrennschalter | [1998/36] | English: | Disconnector for surge arrester | [1998/36] | French: | Sectionneur pour limiteur de surtension | [1998/36] | Examination procedure | 02.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 01.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/10] | 07.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4577148 (SWEETANA ANDREW S [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 36 - line 42 * * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 15; figure 1 *; | [DA]EP0613226 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1,2,4,7,8,10 * abstract *; | [A]EP0702445 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 12* abstract * |