EP0894949 - Insert for silencers or catalysts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reineke, Horst Sonnrain 3 9470 St. Paul/Lavanttal / AT | [1999/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/05] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2002/41] |
Former [1999/05] | Beer, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing., et al Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 98890199.7 | 07.07.1998 | [1999/05] | Priority number, date | AT19970001189 | 10.07.1997 Original published format: AT 118997 | [1999/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0894949 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0894949 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F01N1/00, F01N3/28, F01N3/24 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
F01N3/2814 (EP);
B01J35/56 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/05] | F01N1/00, F01N3/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, LI [2003/24] |
Former [1999/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Einsatz für Schalldämpfer oder Katalysatoren | [1999/05] | English: | Insert for silencers or catalysts | [1999/05] | French: | Insert pour silencieux ou catalysateurs | [1999/05] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/41] | 14.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/41] | 20.03.2003 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 21.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 27.02.2004 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request rejected | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 31.07.2003 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   26.01.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE437248 (JOSEPH E.A. PIERARD) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]GB694376 (BIRMINGHAM SMALL ARMS CO LTD) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]FR1318299 (FASPA S A) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]US3088271 (SMITH GORDON R) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]US3393767 (MONK TRAVIS B) [DA] 1,5 * abstract *; | [DA]DE3319529 (CURRIE NEIL LAWRENCE) [DA] 1,5* abstract *; | [DA]US4683978 (VENTER PHILIPPUS [ZA]) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE3719773 (SUEDDEUTSCHE KUEHLER BEHR [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]FR2617903 (ROSI SA ETS [FR]) [A] 1 * page 3, lines 26-30 * * page 7, lines 20-24; figures 1,4,10 *; | [Y]FR2622632 (ROSI SA ETS [FR]) [Y] 1-4,6 * page 2, column 2, lines 22-25,31-34 * * column 4, lines 5,6,21,22 * * column 5, lines 2-8,10,11; figures 3,5 *; | [Y]DE9315010U (GILLET HEINRICH GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-4,6 * page 2, paragraph 5 * * page 3, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 5, paragraph 4; figures 5-8 *; | [A]US5628925 (DOMESLE RAINER [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 29-33,45-48 * * column 6, lines 60-67; figure 6 * | by applicant | GB694376 | FR1318299 | US3088271 | US3393767 | DE3319529 | US4683978 |