EP0917971 - Lateral connector for antiskid chain [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PEWAG AUSTRIA GmbH Theodor-Körner-Strasse 59 8021 Graz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/21] | For all designated states Pewag Austria GmbH Theodor-Körner-Strasse 59 8021 Graz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Manhal, Herbert Berlinerring 60 8047 Graz / AT | 02 /
Schuster, Theodor Oed 36 8312 Ottendorf / AT | [1999/21] | Representative(s) | Matschnig, Franz Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG Siebensterngasse 54 1071 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/21] | Matschnig, Franz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Siebensterngasse 54, Postfach 252 1071 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 98890341.5 | 16.11.1998 | [1999/21] | Priority number, date | AT19970000735U | 25.11.1997 Original published format: AT 73597 U | [1999/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0917971 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0917971 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | [2001/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0917971 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60C27/10 | [1999/21] | CPC: |
B60C27/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [2001/49] |
Former [1999/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Seitenhalterung für eine Gleitschutzkette | [1999/21] | English: | Lateral connector for antiskid chain | [1999/21] | French: | Connection latérale pour chaîne anti-patinage | [1999/21] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/45] | 07.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 22.09.2005 | [2005/50] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2036172 (GAGNON BERNARD E) [A] 1* page 1, column L, line 28 - line 48 *; | [DA]DE2731296 (MILZ ARTHUR) [DA] 1 * page 5, paragraph L; figure 1 *; | [A]AT383547B (FERDINAND FREIHERR V HELLDORFF [AT]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 24 - line 30; figure 17 *; | [A]DE4402811 (MANGOLD A OBERLAND SCHNEEKETTE [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 4; figure 7 * * column 5, line 37 - line 42; figure 13 * | by applicant | DE2731296 | AT384547B |