EP0966343 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE EXTRUSION OF A POLYMERIC SUBSTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cheming S.A. Luxembourg 50, Val Fleuri 1526 Luxembourg / LU | [1999/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLASMATI-LÜCHINGER, Maria, Teresa Via Mola 10 CH-6877 Coldrerio / CH | [1999/52] | Representative(s) | Fiammenghi-Domenighetti, Delfina Fiammenghi-Fiammenghi Via San Gottardo 15 6900 Lugano / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/52] | Fiammenghi-Domenighetti, Delfina Fiammenghi-Fiammenghi, Via San Gottardo 15 6900 Lugano / CH | Application number, filing date | 98900106.0 | 09.01.1998 | [1999/52] | WO1998IB00021 | Priority number, date | CH19970000041 | 10.01.1997 Original published format: CH 4197 | [1999/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9830373 | Date: | 16.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0966343 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B29B7/74 | [1999/52] | CPC: |
B29B7/7447 (EP,US);
B29B7/74 (KR);
B65D83/207 (EP,US);
B65D83/682 (EP,US);
B05B9/0827 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM EXTRUDIEREN EINES POLYMEREN SUBSTANZ | [1999/52] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE EXTRUSION OF A POLYMERIC SUBSTANCE | [1999/52] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR L'EXTRUSION D'UNE SUBSTANCE POLYMERE | [1999/52] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.04.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.09.1999 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   04.10.1999 | 13.09.1999 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   04.10.1999 | 13.09.1999 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   04.10.1999 | 13.09.1999 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   04.10.1999 | 13.09.1999 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   04.10.1999 | 13.09.1999 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   04.10.1999 | 13.09.1999 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   04.10.1999 | 13.09.1999 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   04.10.1999 | 13.09.1999 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   04.10.1999 | 13.09.1999 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   04.10.1999 | 13.09.1999 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   04.10.1999 | 13.09.1999 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   04.10.1999 | 13.09.1999 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   04.10.1999 | 13.09.1999 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   04.10.1999 | 13.09.1999 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   04.10.1999 | 13.09.1999 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   04.10.1999 | 13.09.1999 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   04.10.1999 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.09.1999 | M01   Fee paid on   04.10.1999 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.05.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]BE546646 (BAYER) [A] 6-8,12,16,17,21* the whole document *; | [X]DE8620204U (COCON KUNSTSTOFFEN) [X] 1 * page 3, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 2; figure -; claim - *; | [X]EP0287043 (EHRENSPERGER C AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,4-7,10,11,13-17,20,22-25 * column 8, line 21 - line 28 *; | [X]US5092492 (CENTEA MARK E [US]) [X] 1-6,8,10,11,13-16,20,22-25 * column 3, line 39 - line 49 * * column 6, line 54 - column 7, line 9 * |