EP1045536 - OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION NETWORK DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2005 [2005/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/42] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKATA, Tsuneo Room B307, 4-14-6, Nishikoigakubo Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo 185 / JP | [2000/42] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/42] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98900197.9 | 09.01.1998 | [2000/42] | WO1998JP00055 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9935768 | Date: | 15.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1045536 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/20 | [2000/42] | CPC: |
H04B10/271 (EP);
H04B10/275 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/42] | Title | German: | FASEROPTISCHES KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERKGERÄT | [2000/42] | English: | OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION NETWORK DEVICE | [2000/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION A FIBRES OPTIQUES | [2000/42] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2000 | Translation filed | 31.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2000 | Search fee paid | 31.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 31.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/42] | 25.09.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/12] | 13.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH06209295 ; | [X]JPH08107393 ; | [Y]JPH09182119 |