EP0991012 - IC CARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM CO., LTD. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 651 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states ROHM Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 651 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAEDA, Hiroyuki, Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615 / JP | 02 /
FUJISAWA, Masanori, Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615 / JP | [2000/14] | Representative(s) | Prüfer, Lutz H. Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/14] | Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys. Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98900201.9 | 09.01.1998 | [2000/14] | WO1998JP00059 | Priority number, date | JP19970037980 | 21.02.1997 Original published format: JP 3798097 | [2000/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9837510 | Date: | 27.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0991012 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0991012 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.08.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/073, G06F12/16 | [2000/14] | CPC: |
G06K19/07703 (EP,US);
G06K19/073 (EP,KR,US);
G06K19/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/14] | Title | German: | CHIP-KARTE | [2000/14] | English: | IC CARD | [2000/14] | French: | CARTE A CIRCUIT INTEGRE | [2000/14] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.1999 | Translation filed | 23.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.1999 | Search fee paid | 23.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 23.07.1999 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 23.07.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 03.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 03.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4749982 (RIKUNA KENJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7,8 * column 6, line 1 - column 9, line 31; figures 2,3,10 * [Y] 2,6; | [YA]EP0282926 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [Y] 2 * column 1, line 51 - column 3, line 25; figure 2 * [A] 1; | [Y]US5479172 (SMITH GREGORY M [US], et al) [Y] 6 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPH04113489 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [P]JPH09114945 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [T]JPH1011555 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JPH03288289 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO); | [A]JPH01189745 (NEC CORP) |