EP0971472 - CONTROL DEVICE WITH FORCED OPERATION FUNCTION AND SEMICONDUCTOR INTEGRATED CIRCUIT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM CO., LTD. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states ROHM CO., LTD. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJITA, Hiroyuki Rohm Co., Ltd.,21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho,Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615 / JP | 02 /
INOUE, Koichi Rohm Co., Ltd.,21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho,Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615 / JP | [2000/02] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98900213.4 | 09.01.1998 | [2000/02] | WO1998JP00076 | Priority number, date | JP19970003510 | 13.01.1997 Original published format: JP 351097 | [2000/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9831085 | Date: | 16.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0971472 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H02J1/00, G01R31/28, H01L27/04, H02J7/00, G05F1/56, G06F1/28 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
H02J7/0031 (EP,KR);
H02J1/00 (EP,KR);
H02J7/0013 (EP);
H02J7/00302 (EP,KR);
H02J7/0048 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/02] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT VORRANGSFUNKTION UND INTEGRIERTE HALBLEITERSCHALTUNG | [2000/02] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE WITH FORCED OPERATION FUNCTION AND SEMICONDUCTOR INTEGRATED CIRCUIT DEVICE | [2000/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONTROLE MUNI D'UNE FONCTION D'EXPLOITATION FORCEE ET DISPOSITIF DE CIRCUITS INTEGRES A SEMICONDUCTEURS | [2000/02] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.1999 | Translation filed | 09.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.1999 | Search fee paid | 09.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 09.07.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 01.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/10] | 10.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH03137581 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JPS58207648 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]JPH07241040 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) |