15.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
25.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
26.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] |
06.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] |
17.10.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] |
05.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.10.2003 [2003/43] |
08.08.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.09.2003 [2003/39] |
13.06.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] |
30.05.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.07.2003 [2003/29] |
16.05.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.07.2003 [2003/27] |
25.10.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.12.2002 [2002/50] |
16.10.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.06.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
21.06.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.06.2002 |
Change - German title |
published on 07.08.2002 [2002/32] |
03.06.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
18.02.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
15.02.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
24.10.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.07.2001 |
First examination report |
|
27.07.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
13.02.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.06.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.07.2000 [2000/29] |
02.06.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.07.2000 [2000/29] |
09.02.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.10.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.09.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.08.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.10.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.09.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.02.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|