EP0895269 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING IMAGE DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.03.2004 [2004/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAYAMA, Akira, Sony Corp. 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | [1999/05] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frithjof E. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98900370.2 | 14.01.1998 | [1999/05] | WO1998JP00118 | Priority number, date | JP19970005807 | 16.01.1997 Original published format: JP 580797 | [1999/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9832148 | Date: | 23.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0895269 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0895269 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.07.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01J9/40, G02F1/1333 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
H01J9/40 (EP,US);
H01J2217/49 (EP,US);
H01J2329/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/05] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN EINER BILDANZEIGE | [1999/05] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING IMAGE DISPLAY | [1999/05] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN AFFICHEUR | [1999/05] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.1998 | Translation filed | 08.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.1998 | Search fee paid | 08.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.1998 | Examination requested [1999/05] | 09.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2210012 (THORN ELECTRICAL IND LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * claims 1-9 *; | [A]FR2225833 (IBM [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1-5 * | International search | [A]JPS5724620B ; | [A]JPS4812980 ; | [A]JPS4120752Y |