EP0954645 - PILE AND METHOD OF DRIVING A PILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Target Fixings Ltd. Holpur House, 5 Albert Road Crowthorne Berkshire, RG45 7LT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states Target Fixings Ltd. Holpur House, 5 Albert Road Crowthorne, Berkshire, RG45 7LT / GB | ||
Former [2002/50] | For all designated states Target Fixings Ltd. Beechey House, 87 Church Street Crowthorne, Berkshire, RG45 7AW / GB | ||
Former [2001/16] | For all designated states Target Fixings Ltd Beechey House 87 Church Street Crowthorne, Berkshire, RG45 7AW / GB | ||
Former [1999/45] | For all designated states Target Fastenings Limited 60 High Street Chobham, Surrey GU24 8LA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALL, Robert, Stephen The Old Mill House,Washwater Newbury Berkshire RG20 0LP / GB | 02 /
HALL, David, John Ward's Cottage,Upottery Near Honiton Devon EX14 9PF / GB | [1999/45] | Representative(s) | Flint, Adam Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/45] | Flint, Adam W.H. Beck, Greener & Co., 7 Stone Buildings, Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98900576.4 | 12.01.1998 | [1999/45] | WO1998GB00082 | Priority number, date | GB19970000607 | 14.01.1997 Original published format: GB 9700607 | GB19970022039 | 17.10.1997 Original published format: GB 9722039 | [1999/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9830757 | Date: | 16.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0954645 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0954645 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E02D5/56, E02D7/02, E02D5/54 | [1999/45] | CPC: |
E02D5/56 (EP,US);
E02D5/54 (EP,US);
E02D7/02 (EP,US);
E02D2200/143 (EP,US);
E02D2200/1671 (EP,US);
E02D7/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/01] |
Former [1999/45] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | PFAHL UND VERFAHREN ZUM EINRAMMEN DES PFAHLS | [1999/45] | English: | PILE AND METHOD OF DRIVING A PILE | [1999/45] | French: | PIEU ET SON PROCEDE D'UTILISATION | [1999/45] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 31.01.2001 | Observations by third parties | 01.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.12.2002 | CH | 11.12.2002 | FI | 11.12.2002 | GR | 11.12.2002 | IT | 11.12.2002 | LI | 11.12.2002 | MC | 31.01.2003 | DK | 11.03.2003 | PT | 11.03.2003 | SE | 11.03.2003 | ES | 27.06.2003 | [2008/15] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
CH | 11.12.2002 | ||
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
LI | 11.12.2002 | ||
MC | 31.01.2003 | ||
DK | 11.03.2003 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
CH | 11.12.2002 | ||
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
LI | 11.12.2002 | ||
DK | 11.03.2003 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
CH | 11.12.2002 | ||
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
LI | 11.12.2002 | ||
DK | 11.03.2003 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
CH | 11.12.2002 | ||
FI | 11.12.2002 | ||
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
LI | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/39] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
CH | 11.12.2002 | ||
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
LI | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 11.12.2002 | |
GR | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 11.12.2002 | |
PT | 11.03.2003 | ||
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 11.03.2003 | |
SE | 11.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 11.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US2332990 (TAPPAN COLLINS) [X] 12,13,15 * page 2, column R, line 3 - line 52; figures 3,4 * [A] 6,7 [Y] 1-4,9,11; | [AD]US4650372 (GORRELL DONALD B [US]) [AD] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [YD]EP0246589 (DELMAG MASCHINENFABRIK [DE]) [YD] 1-4,9,11* page 5, line 33 - page 14, line 6; figures 1-9 * | other | GB2262560 |