EP0917766 - DECODER FOR TRELLIS ENCODED INTERLEAVED DATA STREAM AND HDTV RECEIVER INCLUDING SAID DECODER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2004 [2004/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/21] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WITTIG, Karl Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
HULYALKAR, Samir Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1999/21] | Representative(s) | Schoenmaker, Maarten, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/21] | Schoenmaker, Maarten, et al Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 98900639.0 | 29.01.1998 | [1999/21] | WO1998IB00116 | Priority number, date | US19970800637 | 14.02.1997 Original published format: US 800637 | [1999/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9836500 | Date: | 20.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0917766 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 20.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/00 | [1999/21] | CPC: |
H03M13/256 (EP,US);
H03M13/2703 (EP,US);
H03M13/3961 (EP,US);
H03M13/4107 (EP,US);
H03M13/4169 (EP,US);
H03M13/6502 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/21] | Title | German: | DECODER FÜR TRELLISKODIERTEN VERSCHACHTELTEN DATENSTROM UND HDTV-EMPFÄNGER MITDIESEM DECODER | [1999/21] | English: | DECODER FOR TRELLIS ENCODED INTERLEAVED DATA STREAM AND HDTV RECEIVER INCLUDING SAID DECODER | [1999/21] | French: | DECODEUR POUR FLUX DE DONNEES CODEES EN TREILLIS ET RECEPTEUR TVHD COMPRENANT CE DECODEUR | [1999/21] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/21] | 22.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/33] | 09.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0677967 (GOLD STAR CO [KR]); | [Y]US5291499 (BEHRENS RICHARD T [US], et al); | [AP]EP0801502 (THOMSON MULTIMEDIA SA [FR]); | [A]EP0465782 (COMMUNICATIONS RESEARCH LAB MI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0677964 (GOLD STAR CO [KR]) |