Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3992748B | Global Dossier | 17.10.2007 | B2 | JP2001510376 | 31.07.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | IB9800121 | 30.01.1998 | CH24697 | 05.02.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU730550B | Global Dossier | 08.03.2001 | B2 | AU5572898 | 26.08.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | IB9800121 | 30.01.1998 | CH24697 | 05.02.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1014892 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2003 | B1 | EP1014892 | 05.07.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IB9800121 | 30.01.1998 | CH24697 | 05.02.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE245953T | 15.08.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | IB9800121 | 30.01.1998 | CH24697 | 05.02.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69816840T | 13.05.2004 | T2 | DE69816840D1 | 04.09.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | IB9800121 | 30.01.1998 | CH24697 | 05.02.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1014892T | 17.11.2003 | T3 | Priority number | Date | IB9800121 | 30.01.1998 | CH24697 | 05.02.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6200327 | 13.03.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | IB9800121 | 30.01.1998 | CH24697 | 05.02.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9834566 | Global Dossier | 13.08.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH24697 | 05.02.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CH691285 | 29.06.2001 | A5 | Priority number | Date | CH24697 | 05.02.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2205435T | 01.05.2004 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CH24697 | 05.02.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1014892E | 31.12.2003 | E | Priority number | Date | CH24697 | 05.02.1997 |